U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-01063
  • Case Name: Gray v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association as Trustee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 13, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • December 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.