U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11703
  • Case Name: Paul A. Duhon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Agreed Order]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Approve]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Supplemental Document]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Waive]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice to Consumer Debtor]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.