U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11702
  • Case Name: Gillian I. Edomwonyi
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Signature Page]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order to Update]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.