U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11700
  • Case Name: Debra D Dale
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Intent]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Extend Time]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order to Update]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.