U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40835
  • Case Name: Jason W Cochrane
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Signature Page]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.