U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11715
  • Case Name: Jon D. Albert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Payment of Fee (Final Online Installment Payment only)]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order (Generic)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Withdraw Document]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Signature Page]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.