U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30435
  • Case Name: Myra Y. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Signature Page]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.