U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40843
  • Case Name: Pamela Caliskan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Signature Page]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Intent]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Update]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.