U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11725
  • Case Name: Peter Vith Tham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.