U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40845
  • Case Name: Genevieve Alvarado
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Change of Address (Proof of Claim)]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Signature Page]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.