U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11733
  • Case Name: Xavier Rosado
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.