U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11745
  • Case Name: Jill. C Staaf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Dismiss Case]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amended Document]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.