U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30440
  • Case Name: Emmanuel Toffe Bile and Hortense Yvonne Bile
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Assignment of Claims]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Amended Document]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Signature Page]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Signature Page]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.