U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11747
  • Case Name: Debora Lee Demello
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Signature Page]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Signature Page]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order (Generic)]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.