U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11750
  • Case Name: Olric Mayhew
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Intent]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.