U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11749
  • Case Name: Angela Marie Galinauskas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Approve]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Response]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Objection]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Employ]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Response]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Approve]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice to Consumer Debtor]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Intent]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Affidavit]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Financial Management Course]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.