U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11752
  • Case Name: Leann Rose Strait
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Extend Time]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Employ]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Response]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order (Generic)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order to Update]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.