U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40860
  • Case Name: Sherwood E. Murray
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.