U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11754
  • Case Name: Adalberto P Teixeira
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Financial Management Course]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Signature Page]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Status Report]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Signature Page]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.