U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30444
  • Case Name: Marlene J. Peixoto
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Signature Page]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.