U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11758
  • Case Name: Jennifer L Edmonds
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Amend]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement of Intent]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.