U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11763
  • Case Name: Patricia McGrath
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Signature Page]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.