U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40865
  • Case Name: Anthony A Scionti, Jr. and Madeline A Scionti
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amend]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Signature Page]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.