U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11765
  • Case Name: Steven Newhall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Amend]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Amend]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Signature Page]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.