U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40866
  • Case Name: Kimberly A. Huard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Exhibit]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.