U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-10333-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Logan Paniagua
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.