U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40881
  • Case Name: CJ Construction and Development, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Compel]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • January 02, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Response]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Opposition]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Amended Document]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order To Set Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Extend Time]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Certificate of Vote]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Signature Page]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Amended Document]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order to Update]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.