U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40886
  • Case Name: Cheryl Kalil
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion for Approval]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Approve]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Stipulation]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Signature Page]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.