U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-40025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 11, 2025: [Excludable Delay]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Of Detention]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.