U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40888
  • Case Name: David C. Kerr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Vacate]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.