U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11793
  • Case Name: Alexander Moise
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amend]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Signature Page]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.