U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11798
  • Case Name: The Village Center Group, Limited Partnership
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Join]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Join]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Join]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.