U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11797
  • Case Name: Brian S. Braginton-Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.