U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30454
  • Case Name: Victoria O. Richards
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Signature Page]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.