U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40896
  • Case Name: Kevin Taing
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Opposition]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Status Report]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amend]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Equity Security Holders]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Statement of Non Existence (Sec. 1116)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Scheduling Order(Only Use for Subchapter V cases)]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Extend Time]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Employ]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order to Reassign or Transfer Case]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.