U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11804
  • Case Name: Aaron Marcy Sells
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Extend Time]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Extend Time]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order to Update]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.