U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40897
  • Case Name: Jeffrey K. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Response]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Vacate]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Extend Time]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order to Update]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.