U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30455
  • Case Name: Anthony Troy Bushey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Signature Page]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.