U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11835
  • Case Name: Lauren L. Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice to Consumer Debtor]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order To Set Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.