U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-10356-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fonseca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 04, 2025: [Excludable Delay]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Memorandum - not related to a motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.