U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11849
  • Case Name: Paul F. Cram
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Signature Page]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Order (Generic)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Signature Page]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Order to Update]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Aquino, John [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.