U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40923
  • Case Name: Rebeca Woodworth-Brodie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.