U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40924
  • Case Name: Main Street Massachusetts, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Compensation]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Compromise]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Seal]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Compromise]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Settlement Agreement]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Appear pro hac vice]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Employ]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.