U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11885
  • Case Name: Jason J. Wright
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Extend Time]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Supplemental Document]
  • January 02, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order to Update]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.