U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40929
  • Case Name: Marisa Moore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order to Update]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Intent]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Ch 11]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Compliance/Non Compliance]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.