U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-30002
  • Case Name: Scott Alan Miles
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Intent]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order to Update]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.