U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-04001
  • Case Name: Joseph H. Baldiga, Chapter 7 Trustee of Campisi En v. Archangel Global Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Statement]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
  • April 10, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Stay]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order To Set Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Statement]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Supplemental Document]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 27, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Initial Transmittal to (BAP)/District Court]
  • September 27, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice to District Court]
  • September 27, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Application to Defer Payment]
  • January 04, 2023: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • January 04, 2023: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.