U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baxter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Remark]
  • October 09, 2024: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • October 09, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • October 09, 2024: [Jury Verdict]
  • October 09, 2024: [Proposed Jury Verdict Form]
  • October 04, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • October 04, 2024: [Pretrial Memorandum]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.