U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10011
  • Case Name: Nicholas V LoDico
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Signature Page]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.