U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-30011
  • Case Name: Sean Michael McGrath
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Amend]
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Extend Time]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Order to Update]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.